TN SB0237 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides exceptions to the standard formula required for gasoline blended with ethanol; exceptions to remain in effect until ASTM incorporates changes to the vapor pressure maximums for ethanol blends after this act's effective date. - Amends TCA Section 47-18-1304.
Title
As enacted, provides exceptions to the standard formula required for gasoline blended with ethanol; exceptions to remain in effect until ASTM incorporates changes to the vapor pressure maximums for ethanol blends after this act's effective date. - Amends TCA Section 47-18-1304.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 106 | |
2017-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/07/2017 | |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0125) |
2017-03-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0071) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0648 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 106