TN HB0648 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides exceptions to the standard formula required for gasoline blended with ethanol; exceptions to remain in effect until ASTM incorporates changes to the vapor pressure maximums for ethanol blends after this act's effective date. - Amends TCA Section 47-18-1304.
Title
As enacted, provides exceptions to the standard formula required for gasoline blended with ethanol; exceptions to remain in effect until ASTM incorporates changes to the vapor pressure maximums for ethanol blends after this act's effective date. - Amends TCA Section 47-18-1304.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 106 | |
2017-03-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0237 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 106