TN SB0232 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, a student in any grade kindergarten through five (K-5) who is identified as in need of Tier II or Tier III interventions according to the department of education's RTIĀ² framework to participate in an LEA-approved research-based intervention before the beginning of the next school year to be eligible for promotion to the next grade level. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to summer school for students in grades kindergarten through five (K-5).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateWithdrawn.
2021-03-11SenateRecalled from Senate Education Committee
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0015 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback