TN HB0015 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, a student in any grade kindergarten through five (K-5) who is identified as in need of Tier II or Tier III interventions according to the department of education's RTIĀ² framework to participate in an LEA-approved research-based intervention before the beginning of the next school year to be eligible for promotion to the next grade level. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to summer school for students in grades kindergarten through five (K-5).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0232 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-11 - Withdrawn.