TN SB0231 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1114
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1114
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates limited sales tax refund for certain appliances, furniture, and building supplies purchased in response to flood; creates a study committee to examine and make recommendations regarding fiscal policy on the issue of natural disasters; revises provisions regarding what funds are to be used for certain programs regarding wastewater facilities and water systems. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 63; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, creates limited sales tax refund for certain appliances, furniture, and building supplies purchased in response to flood; creates a study committee to examine and make recommendations regarding fiscal policy on the issue of natural disasters; revises provisions regarding what funds are to be used for certain programs regarding wastewater facilities and water systems. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 16; Title 30; Title 36; Title 39; Title 40; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 55; Title 56; Title 57; Title 61; Title 62; Title 63; Title 67; Title 68; Title 69; Title 70 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Kyle (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Kyle (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1114 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/29/10 | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-08 | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA1632) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1633) | |
2010-06-08 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1634) | |
2010-06-08 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-03 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1559) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - SA1563) | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA1562) | |
2010-06-03 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1509) | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/03/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/02/10 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm to 06/01/10 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in FW&M Com. to 6/1/10 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/recommend, as amended | |
2009-03-11 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0228 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1114