TN SB0222 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor of possessing, owning, selling, transferring, or manufacturing cock fighting paraphernalia with the intent that the paraphernalia be used in promoting, facilitating, training for, or furthering cock fighting. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, creates Class A misdemeanor of possessing, owning, selling, transferring, or manufacturing cock fighting paraphernalia with the intent that the paraphernalia be used in promoting, facilitating, training for, or furthering cock fighting. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 164 | |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0233 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 164