TN SB0216 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires applicants for a technician certificate of registration, master barber certificate of registration, barber instructor certificate of registration, cosmetologist license, manicuring license, cosmetology instructor license, aesthetician license, or natural hair styling license to obtain up to one hour of online or in-person training by a nonprofit on domestic violence. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4, relative to professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21 Pub. Ch. 117
2021-04-21 Effective date(s) 04/13/2021; 01/01/2022
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-03-22HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 1, PNV 4
2021-03-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0021)
2021-03-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-11HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-08SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2021-03-08SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0023)
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021
2021-03-02SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/2/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0120 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback