TN HB0120 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires applicants for a technician certificate of registration, master barber certificate of registration, barber instructor certificate of registration, cosmetologist license, manicuring license, cosmetology instructor license, aesthetician license, or natural hair styling license to obtain up to one hour of online or in-person training by a nonprofit on domestic violence. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4, relative to professions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117 | |
2021-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0216 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021; 01/01/2022