TN SB0216 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, alters hunting and fishing license discounts available to honorably discharged veterans. - Amends TCA Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, alters hunting and fishing license discounts available to honorably discharged veterans. - Amends TCA Title 70.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2017-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/20/2017
2017-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/13/2017
2017-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0185 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-03 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback