TN SB0216 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the air pollution control board, June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 201, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the air pollution control board, June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 201, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-30 Pub. Ch. 204
2015-04-30 Effective date(s) 04/20/2015
2015-04-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-04-10SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-04-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-04-07SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-04-06HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2015-04-06HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-03-19HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-03-16SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-03-16SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2015-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/16/2015
2015-03-11SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/11/2015
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0346 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 204

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback