TN SB0203 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes from February 15 to February 1 the date by which the Tennessee agricultural hall of fame board must deliver a report of the board's activities for the previous two years to the chair of the agriculture and natural resources committee of the house of representatives and the chair of the energy, agriculture and natural resources committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 43; Title 44; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes from February 15 to February 1 the date by which the Tennessee agricultural hall of fame board must deliver a report of the board's activities for the previous two years to the chair of the agriculture and natural resources committee of the house of representatives and the chair of the energy, agriculture and natural resources committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 43; Title 44; Title 53; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12SenateWithdrawn.
2019-02-12SenateRecalled from Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback