TN SB0191 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes a provision authorizing the state board of education to, in its discretion, waive the requirement that a person employed as a supervisor for the supervision of teaching grades 1-12 have a license of qualification issued by the board if the supervisor was employed and serving in that capacity in a nonequalizing local school district as of January 1, 1957. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 76, Nays 7 PNV 1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Aye 29, Nay 0 |
2024-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Cepicky, Moody, Lafferty, Love) |
2024-04-25 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed (Lamar, Lowe, Lundberg, Roberts, Taylor). |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/24/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | H. refused to recede from H. am. no. 1 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment 1 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 25, PNV 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1099) |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1002) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 1 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0781) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0390 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.