TN SB0179 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires chair and vice chair of committee to be members of opposite houses; requires chair and vice chair positions to rotate between houses every two years. - Amends TCA Section 3-7-101(e).
Title
As enacted, requires chair and vice chair of committee to be members of opposite houses; requires chair and vice chair positions to rotate between houses every two years. - Amends TCA Section 3-7-101(e).
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 297 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 04/24/2015 | |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/2/2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/17/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0636 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 297