TN SB0152 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes motorcycle dealers to obtain a temporary permit from the motor vehicle commission to offer to sell or sell motorcycles from a temporary site once per year. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes motorcycle dealers to obtain a temporary permit from the motor vehicle commission to offer to sell or sell motorcycles from a temporary site once per year. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-27HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-03-23SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2017-03-23SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0137)
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2017
2017-03-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
2017-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/20/2017
2017-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/13/2017
2017-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0019 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-01 - Held on desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback