TN HB0019 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes motorcycle dealers to obtain a temporary permit from the motor vehicle commission to offer to sell or sell motorcycles from a temporary site once per year. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, authorizes motorcycle dealers to obtain a temporary permit from the motor vehicle commission to offer to sell or sell motorcycles from a temporary site once per year. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Withdrawn. |
2017-05-01 | House | Held on desk. |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-01-12 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2017-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0152 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-01 - Sponsor(s) Added.