TN SB0150 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TACIR to annually report, instead of only report once, on the impact of the Competitive Wireless Broadband Investment, Deployment, and Safety Act of 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 13; Title 65 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 13; Title 65 and Title 66, relative to wireless broadband.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0343 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.