TN SB0148 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes instead of requires that governor select members of water quality control board from lists of nominees submitted by Tennessee Conservation League, county services association, Farm Bureau, TML, Tennessee Automotive Association and Tennessee Association of Business. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Section 69-3-104.
Title
As introduced, authorizes instead of requires that governor select members of water quality control board from lists of nominees submitted by Tennessee Conservation League, county services association, Farm Bureau, TML, Tennessee Automotive Association and Tennessee Association of Business. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Section 69-3-104.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0271 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0148&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0148.pdf |