TN HB0271 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes instead of requires that governor select members of water quality control board from lists of nominees submitted by Tennessee Conservation League, county services association, Farm Bureau, TML, Tennessee Automotive Association and Tennessee Association of Business. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Section 69-3-104.
Title
As introduced, authorizes instead of requires that governor select members of water quality control board from lists of nominees submitted by Tennessee Conservation League, county services association, Farm Bureau, TML, Tennessee Automotive Association and Tennessee Association of Business. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Section 69-3-104.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-03 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0148 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0271&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0271.pdf |