TN SB0136 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing required fire drills. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 102, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing required fire drills. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 102, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 451 | |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0192 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 451