TN SB0129 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows stickers for disabled drivers' license plates to be affixed on any license plate, instead of only on new specialty earmarked plates. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, allows stickers for disabled drivers' license plates to be affixed on any license plate, instead of only on new specialty earmarked plates. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840 | |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/28/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0207 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 840