TN SB0126 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that standard medical practice does not involve prescribing hormone treatment for gender dysphoric or gender incongruent prepubertal minors; prohibits a healthcare prescriber from prescribing a course of treatment that involves hormone treatment for gender dysphoric or gender incongruent prepubertal minors, except that a healthcare prescriber may prescribe a course of treatment that involves hormone treatments for prepubertal minors for diagnoses of growth deficiencies or other diagnoses unrelated to gender dysphoria or gender incongruency. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to treatment for children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2021 | |
2021-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 460 | |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 24, PNV 0 |
2021-05-03 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0329) |
2021-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 6 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0202) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1027 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 460