TN HB1027 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that standard medical practice does not involve prescribing hormone treatment for gender dysphoric or gender incongruent prepubertal minors; prohibits a healthcare prescriber from prescribing a course of treatment that involves hormone treatment for gender dysphoric or gender incongruent prepubertal minors, except that a healthcare prescriber may prescribe a course of treatment that involves hormone treatments for prepubertal minors for diagnoses of growth deficiencies or other diagnoses unrelated to gender dysphoria or gender incongruency. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to treatment for children.
Sponsors
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 460 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0126 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021