TN SB0122 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes a spay-neuter program for cats and dogs. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes a spay-neuter program for cats and dogs. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2017-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/22/2017
2017-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-17SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1035 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback