TN SB0119 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the offense of theft to include evading a component of an anti-shoplifting device, interfering with a fire alarm system, or using any artifice or article to commit or facilitate a theft, and makes other various changes; punishes a fifth or subsequent conviction in a two-year period one classification higher and imposes a fine of not less than $300 nor more than the maximum amount established for the appropriate offense classification. - Amends TCA Section 39-14-146.
Title
As enacted, expands the offense of theft to include evading a component of an anti-shoplifting device, interfering with a fire alarm system, or using any artifice or article to commit or facilitate a theft, and makes other various changes; punishes a fifth or subsequent conviction in a two-year period one classification higher and imposes a fine of not less than $300 nor more than the maximum amount established for the appropriate offense classification. - Amends TCA Section 39-14-146.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Doug Overbey [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 184 | |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0056 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 184