TN SB0102 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the method of selection of trustees of TCRS representing teachers and retired teachers from election by the representative assemblies of the Tennessee Education Association and the Tennessee Retired Teachers Association respectively to appointment by the speakers of the senate and the house; authorizes professional education employees' organizations to recommend persons to the speaker of each chamber of the general assembly for appointment to teacher trustee positions for TCRS. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-302 and Section 8-34-303.
Title
As enacted, changes the method of selection of trustees of TCRS representing teachers and retired teachers from election by the representative assemblies of the Tennessee Education Association and the Tennessee Retired Teachers Association respectively to appointment by the speakers of the senate and the house; authorizes professional education employees' organizations to recommend persons to the speaker of each chamber of the general assembly for appointment to teacher trustee positions for TCRS. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-302 and Section 8-34-303.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Gresham (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Gresham (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 280 | |
2011-06-03 | Effective date(s) 05/27/11 | |
2011-05-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-18 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-17 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-16 | Passed H., Ayes 58, Nays 40 | |
2011-05-16 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0395) | |
2011-05-16 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-03-10 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-03-09 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 20, Nays 13 | |
2011-03-09 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0025) | |
2011-03-07 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-03-07 | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-03-03 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/7/2011 | |
2011-02-28 | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/7/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/28/2011 | |
2011-02-23 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 2/16/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0565 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 280