TN HB0565 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the method of selection of trustees of TCRS representing teachers and retired teachers from election by the representative assemblies of the Tennessee Education Association and the Tennessee Retired Teachers Association respectively to appointment by the speakers of the senate and the house; authorizes professional education employees' organizations to recommend persons to the speaker of each chamber of the general assembly for appointment to teacher trustee positions for TCRS. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-302 and Section 8-34-303.
Title
As enacted, changes the method of selection of trustees of TCRS representing teachers and retired teachers from election by the representative assemblies of the Tennessee Education Association and the Tennessee Retired Teachers Association respectively to appointment by the speakers of the senate and the house; authorizes professional education employees' organizations to recommend persons to the speaker of each chamber of the general assembly for appointment to teacher trustee positions for TCRS. - Amends TCA Section 8-34-302 and Section 8-34-303.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 280 | |
2011-05-16 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Education | |
2011-02-14 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0102 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 280