TN SB0095 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the University of Memphis, board of trustees to June 30, 2027. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 8, relative to the University of Memphis, board of trustees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 317 | |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/22/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/17/2021 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0315 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021