TN SB0090 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the use of a driver license from another state to establish a person's identity for the purposes of being issued a photo identification license by the department of safety for the purposes of voting. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the use of a driver license from another state to establish a person's identity for the purposes of being issued a photo identification license by the department of safety for the purposes of voting. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0133 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee