TN SB0084 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the “Tennessee Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act,” which include excluding from coverage certain persons receiving payments through structured settlements, establishing procedures during delinquency proceedings, setting the amount of assessments for long-term care insurance written by impaired or insolvent member insurers, and other changes. - Amends TCA Section 56-12-202; Section 56-12-203; Section 56-12-204; Section 56-12-205; Section 56-12-207; Section 56-12-208 and Section 56-12-218.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the “Tennessee Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act,” which include excluding from coverage certain persons receiving payments through structured settlements, establishing procedures during delinquency proceedings, setting the amount of assessments for long-term care insurance written by impaired or insolvent member insurers, and other changes. - Amends TCA Section 56-12-202; Section 56-12-203; Section 56-12-204; Section 56-12-205; Section 56-12-207; Section 56-12-208 and Section 56-12-218.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 5 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0039) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0151 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 5