TN HB0151 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to the “Tennessee Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act,” which include excluding from coverage certain persons receiving payments through structured settlements, establishing procedures during delinquency proceedings, setting the amount of assessments for long-term care insurance written by impaired or insolvent member insurers, and other changes. - Amends TCA Section 56-12-202; Section 56-12-203; Section 56-12-204; Section 56-12-205; Section 56-12-207; Section 56-12-208 and Section 56-12-218.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes to the “Tennessee Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act,” which include excluding from coverage certain persons receiving payments through structured settlements, establishing procedures during delinquency proceedings, setting the amount of assessments for long-term care insurance written by impaired or insolvent member insurers, and other changes. - Amends TCA Section 56-12-202; Section 56-12-203; Section 56-12-204; Section 56-12-205; Section 56-12-207; Section 56-12-208 and Section 56-12-218.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-03-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-07HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-05HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-03-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-03-04SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-02-28SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-26HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-02-25HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-02-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0004)
2019-02-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2019
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/21/2019
2019-02-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-13HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
2019-02-01HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-28HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0084 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback