TN SB0078 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, urges the department of revenue to study the enforcement of disabled parking violations; requires department to report its findings and recommendations on or before February 1, 2020, to the transportation and safety committee of the senate and transportation committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, urges the department of revenue to study the enforcement of disabled parking violations; requires department to report its findings and recommendations on or before February 1, 2020, to the transportation and safety committee of the senate and transportation committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4
2019-02-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-21SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0010)
2019-02-21SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019
2019-02-13SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/13/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-01-29SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0131 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-08 - Pub. Ch. 4

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback