TN HB0131 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, urges the department of revenue to study the enforcement of disabled parking violations; requires department to report its findings and recommendations on or before February 1, 2020, to the transportation and safety committee of the senate and transportation committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, urges the department of revenue to study the enforcement of disabled parking violations; requires department to report its findings and recommendations on or before February 1, 2020, to the transportation and safety committee of the senate and transportation committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 21, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Pub. Ch. 4
2019-03-08 Effective date(s) 03/07/2019
2019-03-07 Signed by Governor.
2019-03-04HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-02-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2019-02-21SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-02-21SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-02-18HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 2, PNV 1
2019-02-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0002)
2019-02-14HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/18/2019
2019-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/14/2019
2019-02-12HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-02-06HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/12/2019
2019-02-05HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-01-30HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/5/2019
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2019-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2019-01-28HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0078 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback