TN SB0068 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates new form of aggravated assault consisting of an assault that results in the death of another and punishes the new offense from within Range II of the sentence for an aggravated assault not causing death. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, creates new form of aggravated assault consisting of an assault that results in the death of another and punishes the new offense from within Range II of the sentence for an aggravated assault not causing death. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0031 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee