TN SB0059 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 268
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, exempts signs that are no more than 20 feet above ground level, or signs having a total sign face area more than 120 square feet if the sign is more than 15 feet above ground level, from requirement that a registered architect or engineer must prepare plans and specifications for any building or structure; exemption will not apply if, in the opinion of the local government building official, failure of the support system for the sign is likely to cause harm to people or property. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, exempts signs that are no more than 20 feet above ground level, or signs having a total sign face area more than 120 square feet if the sign is more than 15 feet above ground level, from requirement that a registered architect or engineer must prepare plans and specifications for any building or structure; exemption will not apply if, in the opinion of the local government building official, failure of the support system for the sign is likely to cause harm to people or property. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-29 Pub. Ch. 268
2009-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/21/09
2009-05-21 Signed by Governor.
2009-05-13 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2009-05-13 Signed by H. Speaker
2009-05-12 Signed by S. Speaker
2009-05-12 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2009-05-11 Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
2009-05-11 Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0383)
2009-05-11 Subst. for comp. HB.
2009-04-20 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2009-04-16 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2009-04-16 Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0
2009-04-16 S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0208)
2009-04-14 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/16/2009
2009-04-07 Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2009-04-02 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009
2009-03-31 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/7/2009
2009-03-26 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/31/2009
2009-03-24 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/31/2009
2009-03-19 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/24/2009
2009-03-17 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/24/2009
2009-03-12 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/17/2009
2009-03-10 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/17/2009
2009-03-05 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/10/2009
2009-03-03 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/10/2009
2009-02-26 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/03/2009
2009-02-24 Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/3/2009
2009-02-18 Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 02/24/2009
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-01-28 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0867 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback