TN HB0867 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts signs that are no more than 20 feet above ground level, or signs having a total sign face area more than 120 square feet if the sign is more than 15 feet above ground level, from requirement that a registered architect or engineer must prepare plans and specifications for any building or structure; exemption will not apply if, in the opinion of the local government building official, failure of the support system for the sign is likely to cause harm to people or property. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, exempts signs that are no more than 20 feet above ground level, or signs having a total sign face area more than 120 square feet if the sign is more than 15 feet above ground level, from requirement that a registered architect or engineer must prepare plans and specifications for any building or structure; exemption will not apply if, in the opinion of the local government building official, failure of the support system for the sign is likely to cause harm to people or property. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 268 | |
2009-05-11 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/11/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/07/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Commerce | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0059 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 268
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0867&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0867.pdf |