TN SB0055 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, broadens eligibility for Tennessee River resort district status. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, broadens eligibility for Tennessee River resort district status. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0260 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0055&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0055.pdf |