TN SB0041 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes licensed clinical social workers who are engaged solely in independent clinical practice in proceedings in which the department of children's services is the petitioner or intervening petitioner, exempt from subpoena to trial but subject to subpoena to a deposition. - Amends TCA Title 24, Chapter 9, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, makes licensed clinical social workers who are engaged solely in independent clinical practice in proceedings in which the department of children's services is the petitioner or intervening petitioner, exempt from subpoena to trial but subject to subpoena to a deposition. - Amends TCA Title 24, Chapter 9, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 851
2018-04-18SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateSenate Reset on calendar 4/18/18
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
2018-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/3/2018
2018-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
2017-04-19SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/19/2017
2017-04-18SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/19/2017
2017-04-17SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017
2017-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0003 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 851

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback