TN HB0003 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 851
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes licensed clinical social workers who are engaged solely in independent clinical practice in proceedings in which the department of children's services is the petitioner or intervening petitioner, exempt from subpoena to trial but subject to subpoena to a deposition. - Amends TCA Title 24, Chapter 9, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, makes licensed clinical social workers who are engaged solely in independent clinical practice in proceedings in which the department of children's services is the petitioner or intervening petitioner, exempt from subpoena to trial but subject to subpoena to a deposition. - Amends TCA Title 24, Chapter 9, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 851 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 79, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0003 |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1062) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2017-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-01-12 | House | Ref. Civil Justice Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees |
2017-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-12-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0041 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 851