TN SB0032 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, names bridge on U.S. 431 in Maury County in honor of the late Casey Grant Heithcock.
Title
As introduced, names bridge on U.S. 431 in Maury County in honor of the late Casey Grant Heithcock.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Recalled from S. T&S Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0205 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-19 - No action taken
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0032&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0032.pdf |