TN SB0024 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts active-duty military service members and veterans who have specialties as military police, special operations, or special forces from handgun carry permit firing range requirements. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, exempts active-duty military service members and veterans who have specialties as military police, special operations, or special forces from handgun carry permit firing range requirements. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 159 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/24/2017 | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-30 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0027 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 159