TN SB0015 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that the county mayor has the authority to establish and implement health policies that affect the entire county during a county-wide health emergency; directs the county health director, health officer, and board of health to provide advice to the mayor to develop the policies; applies only in Shelby, Davidson, Knox, Hamilton, Sullivan, and Madison counties. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 68, Chapter 2, Part 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5 and Title 68, Chapter 2, Part 6, relative to public health emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateRe-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021
2021-03-31SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/31/2021
2021-03-17SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17SenateAction deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/24/21
2021-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/17/2021
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-12-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0007 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback