TN SB0010 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-18 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, when determining the amount of bail, creates a presumption that any defendant not lawfully present in the United States is a risk of flight. - Amends TCA Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, when determining the amount of bail, creates a presumption that any defendant not lawfully present in the United States is a risk of flight. - Amends TCA Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-18 Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2009-06-18 Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/18/2009
2009-06-18 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2009-06-18 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/18/2009
2009-06-16 Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6-17-09
2009-06-16 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/16/2009
2009-06-15 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/16/2009
2009-06-15 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/15/2009
2009-06-12 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/15/2009
2009-06-11 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/12/2009
2009-06-11 Action def. in FW&M Comm to 6/12/2009
2009-06-11 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/11/2009
2009-06-10 Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/11/2009
2009-06-10 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/10/2009
2009-06-09 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/10/2009
2009-06-04 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/09/2009
2009-06-03 Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal.
2009-06-02 Placed on FW&M Comm cal. for 6/3/2009
2009-06-02 Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm to 6/3/09
2009-05-28 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2009
2009-05-12 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
2009-05-07 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009
2009-05-06 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009
2009-05-06 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009
2009-05-05 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009
2009-05-01 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009
2009-04-29 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009
2009-04-23 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009
2009-04-23 Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 4/29/09
2009-04-16 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009
2009-04-14 Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2009
2009-04-09 Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009
2009-02-09 Ref. to S. Jud. Comm.
2009-01-14 P2C held on desk pending committee appointments
2009-01-13 Intro., P1C.
2008-12-22 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0013 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-24 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback