TN HB0013 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-24 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, when determining the amount of bail, creates a presumption that any defendant not lawfully present in the United States is a risk of flight. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As introduced, when determining the amount of bail, creates a presumption that any defendant not lawfully present in the United States is a risk of flight. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Budget of FW&M of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 02/24/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 2/24/2010 | |
2010-01-20 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 01/27/2010 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2008-12-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0010 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-18 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0013&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0013.pdf |