TN SB0005 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a volunteer firefighter to receive $800 from the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education for completing 40 hours of training annually. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 24, relative to volunteer firefighters.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-11-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0365 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee