TN SB0004 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to require children under the age of 24 months enrolled or enrolling in a child care facility to receive the pneumococcal conjugate vaccine. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 50; Title 56, Chapter 7 and Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to require children under the age of 24 months enrolled or enrolling in a child care facility to receive the pneumococcal conjugate vaccine. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 50; Title 56, Chapter 7 and Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-15 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to S. GW,H&HR | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk pending committee appointments | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2008-12-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0247 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0004&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0004.pdf |