TN HB0247 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to require children under the age of 24 months enrolled or enrolling in a child care facility to receive the pneumococcal conjugate vaccine. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 50; Title 56, Chapter 7 and Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to require children under the age of 24 months enrolled or enrolling in a child care facility to receive the pneumococcal conjugate vaccine. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 50; Title 56, Chapter 7 and Title 71, Chapter 3, Part 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-18 Assigned to s/c Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources--Government Operations for review
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-01-27 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0004 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. GW,H&HR Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback