TN SB0003 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the state sales and use tax rate on tangible personal property from seven percent to 6.75 percent. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, reduces the state sales and use tax rate on tangible personal property from seven percent to 6.75 percent. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0001 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0003&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0003.pdf |