TN HR0219 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jimmy Ray Farris, Jr., Tennessee Peace Officer Standards and Training Commission
Title
Jimmy Ray Farris, Jr., Tennessee Peace Officer Standards and Training Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-19 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |