TN HR0185 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-25)
Status: Passed on January 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-25)
Status: Passed on January 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
American Heart Association/National Wear Red Day, February 2, 2018
Title
American Heart Association/National Wear Red Day, February 2, 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-01-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-01-22 | House | All Ayes added as Sponsors |
2018-01-22 | House | Adopted, Ayes 99, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-01-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-18 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/22/18 |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |