TN HR0020 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 58-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
President Ronald Reagan
Title
President Ronald Reagan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 77 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-14 | House | Adopted, Ayes 77, Nays 14, PNV 2 |
2019-03-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3-14-19 |
2019-03-04 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2019-02-28 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3-4-19 |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed for introduction |